+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On September 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On September 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 19
January 23, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 18, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor