+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On January 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On June 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 100
March 7, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 16
January 25, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor