+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On July 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
March 19, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
March 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
March 11, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
February 12, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 21
January 22, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
January 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor