+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (74)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Appropriations
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Appropriations
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/08/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Education
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Education
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 03/18/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Education
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 02/07/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Education and Cultural Resources
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Education and Cultural Resources
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 01/23/2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Daniel R Salomon
Type:
Primary Sponsor