+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On November 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On October 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor