+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee State Administration
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 01/13/2021
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor