+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Transmitted to Governor
On April 23, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Signed by President
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Returned from Enrolling
- (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available  
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Sent to Enrolling
On April 14, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Returned to Senate
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- (H) 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (H) 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Hearing
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Referred to Committee
- (H) First Reading
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Transmitted to House
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- (S) 3rd Reading Passed
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (S) 2nd Reading Passed
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Hearing
- (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Referred to Committee
- (S) First Reading
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Introduced
- (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
- (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
- (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
- (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- (C) Executive Director Review
- (C) Draft in Assembly
- (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
- (C) Executive Director Final Review
- (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Back for Redo
- (C) Draft in Legal Review
- (C) Draft in Edit
On February 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft in Edit
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes
- (C) Draft to Requester for Review
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft to Requester for Review
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft On Hold
On November 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2023: (H) 3rd Reading Concurred
- Yeas: 100
April 12, 2023: (H) 2nd Reading Concurred
- Yeas: 100
April 6, 2023: (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 19
March 2, 2023: (S) 3rd Reading Passed
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2023: (S) 2nd Reading Passed
- Yeas: 50
February 24, 2023: (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor