+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing
- Rereferred to Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Legal Review Note
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Diane Sands
Type:
Primary Sponsor