+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
April 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
March 30, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 13
March 29, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
March 25, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor