+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Conference
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Conference on 04/26/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed Conference
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed Conference
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 03/19/2021
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Natural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 01/13/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 11, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor