+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On November 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
March 18, 2013: Do Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2013: Do Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 12, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 18
January 30, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 25, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor