+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 15
March 29, 2011: AMD-4 Kaufmann D/PASS
- Yeas: 50
March 29, 2011: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
March 23, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor