+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
- Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On February 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor