+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Died in Process
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) 3rd Reading Not Passed as Amended by House
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) 3rd Reading Not Passed as Amended by House
- (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments
- (H) 3rd Reading Concurred
- (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (H) Motion Carried
- (H) 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 14, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Printed - New Version Available  
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Amendments Available
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- (H) Hearing
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) On Motion Rules Suspended
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- (H) First Reading
- (H) Referred to Committee
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Transmitted to House
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) 3rd Reading Passed
- (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) 2nd Reading Passed
- (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- (S) Hearing
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- (S) First Reading
- (S) Referred to Committee
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
- (S) Introduced
- (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
- (C) Executive Director Final Review
- (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft in Assembly
- (C) Executive Director Review
- (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
- (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
- (C) Draft in Edit
- (C) Draft in Legal Review
On February 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft to Requester for Review
On February 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft to Requester for Review
On November 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- (C) Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (12)
April 25, 2023: (S) 3rd Reading Failed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 25
April 24, 2023: (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 23
April 21, 2023: (S) 3rd Reading Not Passed as Amended by House
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 44
April 20, 2023: (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Yeas: 50
April 18, 2023: (H) 3rd Reading Concurred
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 42
April 17, 2023: (H) 2nd Reading Concurred
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 43
April 17, 2023: (H) Motion Carried
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 15
April 13, 2023: (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 3
April 3, 2023: (S) On Motion Rules Suspended
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
March 2, 2023: (S) 3rd Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
March 1, 2023: (S) 2nd Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
February 24, 2023: (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor