+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor