+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Received
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 20
April 4, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
March 6, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
March 5, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor