+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 02/25/2021
- Amendments Available
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor