+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (80)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Conference on 04/24/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Free Conference Committee Dissolved
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed Conference
- Free Conference Committee Dissolved Free Conference
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Free Conference Committee Appointed Free Conference
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/10/2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/04/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Highways and Transportation
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Highways and Transportation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Highways and Transportation on 03/26/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Highways and Transportation
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft On Hold
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Steve Fitzpatrick
Type:
Primary Sponsor