+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (72)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Appropriations
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks on 04/04/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
- First Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from 3rd Reading; Placed on 2nd Reading
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Printed - New Version Available
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 03/29/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Natural Resources
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Natural Resources
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 03/25/2019
On March 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
- First Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mark Blasdel
Type:
Primary Sponsor