+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Energy and Telecommunications
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 02/25/2021
- Amendments Available
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- First Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor