+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor