+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
On February 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (10)
April 24, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 33
April 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 10
April 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 33
March 30, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 7
February 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor