+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 5
March 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 14
February 24, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 5
February 23, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
February 19, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor