+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (65)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- On Motion Rules Suspended
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Sponsor List Modified
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 24, 2013: Do Adopt CC Report
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 44
April 24, 2013: Do Adopt Conf Comm Report
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
April 23, 2013: Do Adopt Conf Comm Rpt
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
April 23, 2013: Do Adopt CC Report
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 40
April 11, 2013: Do Not Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
March 20, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 20
February 27, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 12
February 26, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 10
February 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor