+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Business and Labor
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Business and Labor
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 04/14/2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 03/16/2021
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 03/12/2021
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/25/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor