+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor