+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
- Hearing
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor