+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On June 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor