+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor List Modified
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 7
March 30, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
March 24, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 18
February 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
February 19, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Steven Gallus
Type:
Primary Sponsor