+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/04/2021
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/08/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On December 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor