+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Agriculture
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Agriculture
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture on 03/25/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Agriculture on 03/18/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Agriculture
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 02/25/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor