+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (75)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Appropriations
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/11/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Human Services
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Human Services
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Taken from Table in Committee Human Services
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Human Services
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 03/12/2019
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 02/22/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 01/23/2019
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 01/11/2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On October 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jen Gross
Type:
Primary Sponsor