+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Education and Cultural Resources
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Education and Cultural Resources
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 02/24/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor