+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Printed - New Version Available
- Transmitted to House
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor