+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Education
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Education
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 03/15/2019
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Education
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Education and Cultural Resources
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Education and Cultural Resources
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 02/22/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On February 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Roger Webb
Type:
Primary Sponsor