+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
- 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Energy and Telecommunications
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Energy and Telecommunications
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 02/25/2021
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor