+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 46
March 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
February 23, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor