+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On September 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor