+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee State Administration
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Motion Failed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/16/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/08/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/25/2021
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- First Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 14, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor