+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (66)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Business and Labor
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 04/02/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/22/2019
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 02/20/2019
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Diane Sands
Type:
Primary Sponsor