+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (68)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Reconsidered Previous Act; Remains in 2nd Reading FCC Process
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopt Motion Failed
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concur Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (16)
April 28, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 22
April 27, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 37
April 27, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
April 27, 2011: ReconsAction-on 2nd Rd-Hamlett
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 20
April 26, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 26
April 26, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 27
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 39
April 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 43
April 8, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
March 30, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 17
March 29, 2011: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
March 29, 2011: AMD-1 Hamlett D/PASS
- Yeas: 50
March 28, 2011: Take from Tax Comm to 2nd Rd-Hamlett
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 23
March 26, 2011: Take from Tax Comm to 2nd Rd-Hamlett
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2011: Take from Tax Comm to 2nd Rd-Hamlett
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor