+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Energy and Telecommunications
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 02/23/2021
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On November 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor