+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (66)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 10
April 21, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 23
March 31, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 19
March 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
February 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor