+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Taken from Table in Committee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 16, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 15, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 14
March 26, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
February 25, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
February 23, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor