+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 03/26/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 03/24/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Natural Resources
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 02/19/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor