+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor