+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Judiciary
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/24/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor