+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Fish and Game
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Fish and Game
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 02/23/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- First Reading
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor