+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (54)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Business and Labor
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Business and Labor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/18/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/19/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
On February 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor