+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (55)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Failed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 25, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor